Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Armand Gignoux

Deceased

Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1799BornBordeaux
20 Sep 182324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Beauvais, France
22 Dec 184142.5SelectedBishop of Beauvais, France
24 Jan 184242.5ConfirmedBishop of Beauvais, France
29 Mar 184242.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais, France
1 Mar 187878.6DiedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Armand Gignoux (VIAF: 39368328)
Bishop Joseph-Armand Gignoux (born , died ) Bishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016