Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre-Jules Dours

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1809Born
16 Jun 183223.3Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 186354.6SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
21 Dec 186354.8ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
13 Mar 186455.1Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
20 Feb 187667.0ResignedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
12 Dec 187768.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre-Jules Dours (VIAF: 107022963)
Bishop Jean-Pierre-Jules Dours (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlzonne
Ordained BishopCathedral, Laon, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)
Death PlaceBagnères-de-Bigorre

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017