Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

Dioecesis Suessionensis (-Laudunensis-Sanquintinensis)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 June 1901
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Reims
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: France
  • Square Kilometers: 7,378 (2,849 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nord
  • Official Web Site: http://diocesedesoissons.cef.fr/
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, 17 rue des Deportes et Fusilles, B.P. 166, 02204 Soissons CEDEX, France
  • Telephone: 3.23.53.06.35
  • Fax: 3.23.53.41.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Soissons
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Soissons (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Laon (suppressed) Diocese of Soissons
Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)
13 June 1828Name ChangedDiocese of Soissons Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)
Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)
11 June 1901Name ChangedDiocese of Soissons (-Laon) Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)
1948423,000453,00093.4%4812650783444515578ap1951
1970526,346.0%37524399039422578ap1971
1980453,000537,00084.4%297113081,47030364578ap1981
1990479,000563,00085.1%20592142,23814291577ap1991
1999450,000537,25983.8%14391522,9607922243ap2000
2000430,000535,84280.2%13891472,92571020743ap2001
2001425,000535,48979.4%12691353,14810917543ap2002
2002410,000535,48976.6%11981273,228101017343ap2003
2003405,000535,48975.6%11491233,292101116143ap2004
2004390,000535,48972.8%10971163,36210816643ap2005
2010397,187548,01772.5%89111003,971181310643ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013