Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabio Brulart de Sillery

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1655BornGrand Pressigny
28 Mar 168226.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 168933.6SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
1 Nov 168934.0SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
21 Jan 169236.2ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
23 Mar 169236.4Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
19 Nov 171459.0DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Fabio Brulart de Sillery:
Bishop Fabio Brulart de Sillery (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 65, and Page 365
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015