Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Le Tonnelier de Breteuil

Deceased

Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1644BornParis
18 Dec 167733.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 168136.4SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
1 Dec 168137.0ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
1 Feb 168237.2Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
8 Jan 169853.1DiedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France

MicroData Summary for Claude Le Tonnelier de Breteuil:
Bishop Claude Le Tonnelier de Breteuil (born , died ) Bishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer)

  • a priest for 20.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015