Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Estrées

Deceased

Bishop of Laon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1651¹Born
2 Jun 168130.4AppointedBishop of Laon, France
27 Jul 168130.5Ordained BishopBishop of Laon, France
1 Dec 169443.9DiedBishop of Laon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Estrées
Bishop Jean d’Estrées (born 1651, died ) Bishop of Laon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 238
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018