Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-François de Gondi

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornParis
22 Oct 162238.8SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
14 Nov 162238.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
19 Feb 162339.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Paris, France
21 Mar 165470.2DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-François de Gondi:
Archbishop Jean-François de Gondi (died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 274
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 23 Feb 2015