Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Harlay de Champvallon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹BornParis
29 Jun 161125.4Ordained PriestPriest
161327.0SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
9 Sep 161327.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rouen, France
9 Sep 161327.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
2 Mar 161428.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
23 Aug 161529.6SucceededArchbishop of Rouen, France
May 1651³65.3ResignedArchbishop of Rouen, France
22 Mar 165367.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Harlay de Champvallon:
Archbishop François de Harlay de Champvallon (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015