Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Plantavit de la Pause

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodève


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornSainte Croix
29 Mar 162549.2SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
18 Aug 162549.6ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
19 Oct 162549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
Jul 1648³72.5ResignedBishop of Lodève, France
28 May 165175.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodève, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Plantavit de la Pause:
Bishop Jean de Plantavit de la Pause (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodève

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 4 Mar 2015