Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Doni d’Attichy, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Autun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1598BornParis
5 Oct 162830.7SelectedBishop of Riez, France
8 Oct 162931.7ConfirmedBishop of Riez, France
7 Apr 163032.2Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
23 Sep 165254.7AppointedBishop of Autun, France
1 Jul 166466.4DiedBishop of Autun, France

MicroData Summary for Louis-Doni d’Attichy:
Bishop Louis-Doni d’Attichy O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Autun

  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294, and Page 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 4
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015