Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges d’Aubusson de la Feuillade

Deceased

Bishop of Metz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornAubusson
21 Jun 164940.4AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
12 Sep 164940.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Embrun, France
25 Jun 166859.4SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Metz, France
3 Jun 166960.4ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Metz, France
12 May 169788.3DiedBishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges d’Aubusson de la Feuillade:
Archbishop Georges d’Aubusson de la Feuillade (died ) Bishop of Metz

  • a bishop for 47.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015