Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio del Buffalo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Temnus

Bishop of Gallipoli

Titular See: (Jeremías de Vallata)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornVallata
5 Mar 166041.1SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
8 Aug 166142.6ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
8 Aug 166142.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
19 Feb 166243.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
1666²47.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain
14 May 166849.3AppointedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
25 Sep 167758.7DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio del Buffalo:
Bishop Antonio del Buffalo O.F.M. (born 1619, died ) Titular Bishop of Temnus

  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192, and Page 330
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 195, Number 1,223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015