Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Vázquez de Toledo, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cádiz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606²BornToledo
11 Sep 166357.6SelectedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
26 Nov 166357.9ConfirmedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
24 Feb 166458.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cádiz, Spain
30 Dec 167266.9DiedBishop of Cádiz, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Vázquez de Toledo:
Bishop Alfonso Vázquez de Toledo O.F.M. (born 1606, died ) Bishop of Cádiz

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 197, Number 1,237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015