Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrosio Ignacio Spínola y Guzmán

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1632BornMadrid
1656¹23.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 166533.2AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
18 Oct 166533.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
7 Mar 166735.1AppointedArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
23 Jun 166735.4InstalledArchbishop of Valencia, Spain
9 Jun 166836.4AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
7 Oct 166937.7AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
24 May 168452.3DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ambrosio Ignacio Spínola y Guzmán:
Archbishop Ambrosio Ignacio Spínola y Guzmán (born , died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1500, Page 200, Number 1,256
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 357, and Page 268
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015