Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rodríguez Castañon

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1615³BornToro
13 Feb 166246.9AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
29 Jun 166247.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
7 Mar 166752.0AppointedBishop of Zamora, Spain
27 Jan 166852.9DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rodríguez Castañon:
Bishop Antonio Rodríguez Castañon (born , died ) Bishop of Zamora

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,437
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,148
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 195, Number 1,224
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151, and Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 2 Apr 2015