Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anne de Lévis-Ventadour

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹Born
13 Feb 165145.1AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
30 Apr 165145.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
17 Mar 166256.2DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anne de Lévis-Ventadour:
Archbishop Anne de Lévis-Ventadour (died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 116
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015