Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinand de Neufville de Villeroy

Deceased

Bishop of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹Born
15 Apr 164442.2SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Malo, France
13 Jun 164442.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Malo, France
13 Jun 164442.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
28 Aug 164442.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
20 Nov 164644.8SucceededBishop of Saint-Malo, France
19 May 165755.3SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
24 Sep 165755.7ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
8 Jan 169088.0DiedBishop of Chartres, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ferdinand de Neufville de Villeroy (VIAF: 103312066)
Bishop Ferdinand de Neufville de Villeroy (born 1602, died ) Bishop of Chartres

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 45.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101, and Page 227
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast