Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique de Ligni

Deceased

Bishop of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹BornParis
11 Jun 165839.4SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Meaux, France
13 Jan 165940.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Meaux, France
13 Jan 165940.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
9 Mar 165940.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
12 Mar 165940.1SucceededBishop of Meaux, France
27 Apr 168162.3DiedBishop of Meaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominique de Ligni:
Bishop Dominique de Ligni (died ) Bishop of Meaux

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279, and Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015