Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Achille de Harlay de Sancy

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹BornParis
16 Aug 163150.6SelectedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
10 Nov 163150.8ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
Jan 1632³51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Malo, France
20 Nov 164665.8ResignedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
26 Nov 164665.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Achille de Harlay de Sancy:
Bishop Achille de Harlay de Sancy (born 1581, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Malo

  • a bishop for 14.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 227
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015