Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hardouin de Péréfixe de Beaumont

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornBeaumont
26 Apr 164842.3SelectedBishop of Rodez, France
1 Feb 164943.0ConfirmedBishop of Rodez, France
18 Apr 164943.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez, France
30 Jul 166256.5SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
24 Mar 166458.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
1 Jan 167165.0DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hardouin de Péréfixe de Beaumont:
Archbishop Hardouin de Péréfixe de Beaumont (died ) Archbishop of Paris

  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 274, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015