Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles Boutault

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
11 Apr 162629.2SelectedBishop of Aire, France
14 Mar 162730.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aire, France
27 Jun 162730.4ConfirmedBishop of Aire, France
17 Apr 164952.2SelectedBishop of Evreux, France
15 Nov 164952.8ConfirmedBishop of Evreux, France
11 Mar 166164.1DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles Boutault
Bishop Gilles Boutault (born 1597, died ) Bishop of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours

  • a bishop for 33.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 180, and Page 69
  • b/c2+: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018