Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Rueil

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1581¹Born
15 Nov 162140.8AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
2 Jan 162241.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
20 Mar 162847.2AppointedBishop of Angers, France
20 Jan 164968.0DiedBishop of Angers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Rueil (VIAF: 56632732)
Bishop Claude de Rueil (born 1581, died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 82, and Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1622, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018