Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Olce

Deceased

Bishop of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornBasse-Navarre
16 Aug 163227.6SelectedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
20 Dec 163227.9ConfirmedBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
1633²28.0Ordained BishopBishop of Boulogne (-Sur-Mer), France
13 Jun 164338.4AppointedBishop of Agde, France
24 Jun 164338.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
31 Aug 164338.6ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
8 Feb 168176.1DiedBishop of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Olce:
Bishop Jean d’Olce (died ) Bishop of Bayonne

  • a bishop for 48.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108, and Page 117
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 29 Mar 2015