Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bertrand d’Eschaux (de Chaux)

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
17 Mar 159939.2AppointedBishop of Bayonne, France
26 Jun 161757.4AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
21 May 164181.3DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand d’Eschaux (de Chaux)
Archbishop Bertrand d’Eschaux (de Chaux) (born 1560, died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBéarn
Death PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108, and Page 350
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 6*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018