Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Scarron

Deceased

Bishop of Grenoble


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornAgen
14 Dec 162036.9AppointedBishop of Grenoble, France
12 Apr 162137.2Ordained BishopBishop of Grenoble, France
6 Feb 166884.0DiedBishop of Grenoble, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Scarron:
Bishop Pierre Scarron (died ) Bishop of Grenoble

  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 197
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 22 Feb 2015