Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles de Souvre

Deceased

Bishop of Auxerre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1596³Born
17 Feb 161720.9AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
12 Mar 161721.0Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
1625¹28.8ResignedBishop of (Saint-Bernard de) Comminges, France
9 Feb 162629.9AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
19 Sep 163135.5DiedBishop of Auxerre, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilles de Souvre:
Bishop Gilles de Souvre (died ) Bishop of Auxerre

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87, and Page 163
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015