Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Cardinal Rivarola

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575²BornGenoa
10 Dec 160833.9AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
28 Dec 160833.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
30 Mar 160934.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
17 Aug 161136.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 161136.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
3 Jan 162752.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Rivarola:
Domenico Cardinal Rivarola (died ) Titular Archbishop of Nazareth

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Aug 1611
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 254, and Page 76
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 45, Number 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1608, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015