Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastiano o Settimio Roberti (-Vittori)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1573¹Born
11 Mar 160936.1AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
19 Mar 160936.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
1611²38.0ResignedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
19 Dec 166895.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano o Settimio Roberti (-Vittori):
Bishop Sebastiano o Settimio Roberti (-Vittori) (born 1573, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tricarico

  • a bishop for 59.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 343
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 46, Number 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1609, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015