Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Franceschini

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹BornRoma
18 May 161135.3AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
19 Jun 161135.4Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
25 Aug 1612³36.6DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Franceschini:
Bishop Antonio Maria Franceschini (born 1576, died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 50, Number 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015