Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriano Muti

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy

Apostolic Nuncio to Naples


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1599AppointedBishop of Bitetto, Italy
18 Jul 1599Ordained BishopBishop of Bitetto, Italy
15 Nov 1602AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
12 Jan 1609AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
19 Mar 1610DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Muti
Bishop Valeriano Muti (died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152, and Page 115
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 36, Number 179
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134, and Page 169
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast