Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Neuchèze

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1591BornPoiton
7 Oct 162432.9AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
29 Dec 162433.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
1 May 165866.5DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Neuchèze:
Bishop Jacques de Neuchèze (born , died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 4 Mar 2015