Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Renaud de Beaune

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1527Born
18 Jun 157143.8AppointedBishop of Mende, France
10 Jul 158153.9AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 May 159466.7SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
7 Jan 159870.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
27 Sep 160679.1DiedArchbishop of Sens, France

MicroData Summary for Renaud de Beaune (VIAF: 27074194)
Archbishop Renaud de Beaune (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 298, and Page 135
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 7*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018