Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Passelaigue, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Belley, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1629AppointedBishop of Belley, France
24 Mar 1630Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
12 Aug 1663DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for Jean de Passelaigue
Bishop Jean de Passelaigue O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Belley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSancoins

  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,630, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast