Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Berthelot, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

Titular Bishop of Damascus


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Nov 1601AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France
26 Nov 1601AppointedTitular Bishop of Damascus
2 Mar 1602Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Damascus
23 Nov 1630DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Robert Berthelot
Bishop Robert Berthelot O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgogne

  • a bishop for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018