Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine de Bologne, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Digne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Mar 1602AppointedBishop of Digne, France
9 Jun 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
24 Sep 1615DiedBishop of Digne, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine de Bologne
Bishop Antoine de Bologne O.M. (died ) Bishop of Digne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelonnette

  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast