Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jérôme de Villars

Deceased

Archbishop of Vienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547¹Born
3 Apr 159851.2AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
27 Dec 159851.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vienne, France
18 Jan 162679.0DiedArchbishop of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jérôme de Villars
Archbishop Jérôme de Villars (born 1547, died ) Archbishop of Vienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Ordained BishopS. Maurice, Vienne, Archdiocese of Vienne
Death PlaceVienne, Archdiocese of Vienne

  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast