Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Villars (II)

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1543Born
9 May 157532.1AppointedBishop of Mirepoix, France
29 Jun 157532.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mirepoix, France
26 Apr 159148.1AppointedArchbishop of Vienne, France
1598¹54.8ResignedArchbishop of Vienne, France
18 Jul 161370.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Villars (II) (VIAF: 64159467)
Archbishop Pierre de Villars (II) (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon
Ordained BishopSaint Germain des Près, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon

  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 246, and Page 333
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018