Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camille de Neufville de Villeroy

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1606Born
12 Jan 165447.3AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
29 Jun 165447.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lyon, France
3 Jun 169386.7DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Camille de Neufville de Villeroy (VIAF: 206845699)
Archbishop Camille de Neufville de Villeroy (born , died ) Archbishop of Lyon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018