Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean de Lingendes

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
26 Jun 163944.4SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
14 Jul 164247.5ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
14 Dec 164247.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
27 Sep 164752.7ResignedBishop of Sarlat, France
13 Feb 165156.1AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
2 May 166570.3DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Lingendes
Bishop Jean de Lingendes (born 1595, died ) Bishop of Mâcon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoulins

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 305, and Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018