Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard Molé

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornParis
23 Nov 164837.8AppointedBishop of Bayeux, France
14 Feb 164938.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux, France
6 Apr 165241.2DiedBishop of Bayeux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Édouard Molé:
Bishop Édouard Molé (died ) Bishop of Bayeux

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015