Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Guidi di Bagno

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578²BornFirenze
3 Mar 161436.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
13 Apr 161436.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
1 May 162143.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
27 Feb 162749.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
17 May 162749.3AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
30 Aug 162749.6Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
19 Nov 162951.8Elevated to Cardinal
6 Sep 163052.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
26 May 163153.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
16 Apr 163557.2AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
28 Feb 163961.1ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Jul 164163.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieti, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Guidi di Bagno (VIAF: 17272682)
Giovanni Francesco Cardinal Guidi di Bagno (born 1578, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 276, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 146
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 56, Number 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 5
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 13 Oct 2016