Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Netz

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1592Born
27 Jan 163138.9AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
27 Apr 163139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
20 Jan 164653.9DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Netz (VIAF: 191859058)
Bishop Nicolas de Netz (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTours, Archdiocese of Tours

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast