Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Listolfi Maroni

Deceased

Bishop of Bazas, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Nov 1633AppointedBishop of Bazas, France
18 Jun 1634Ordained BishopBishop of Bazas, France
22 May 1645DiedBishop of Bazas, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Listolfi Maroni
Bishop Henri Listolfi Maroni (died ) Bishop of Bazas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGauville la Campagne

  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1634, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018