Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Montrouge

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Flour


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornParis
31 Oct 164635.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
8 Apr 164736.2ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
21 Sep 164736.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
20 Apr 166453.3DiedBishop of Saint-Flour, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Montrouge:
Bishop Jacques Montrouge (died ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 85, and Page 88
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015