Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aimeric de Bragelone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹BornParis
31 May 162343.4SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
29 Apr 162444.3ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
24 Jun 162444.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
1635²55.0ResignedBishop of Luçon, France
1669²89.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aimeric de Bragelone:
Bishop Aimeric de Bragelone , Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 6 Mar 2015