Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hector d’Ouvrier

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1630AppointedBishop of Dol, France
2 Aug 1630Ordained BishopBishop of Dol, France
19 Feb 1644SelectedBishop of Nîmes, France
2 May 1644ConfirmedBishop of Nîmes, France
20 Jun 1655DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

MicroData Summary for Hector d’Ouvrier:
Bishop Hector d’Ouvrier (died ) Bishop of Nîmes

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 255
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 6 Mar 2015