Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri de Béthune

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1604Born
19 Nov 162925.1AppointedBishop of Maillezais, France
6 Jan 163025.3Ordained BishopBishop of Maillezais, France
21 Nov 164642.2SelectedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
18 May 164843.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
11 May 168075.6DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

MicroData Summary for Henri de Béthune
Archbishop Henri de Béthune (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 123, and Page 229
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018