Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Sévin

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1613¹BornParis
30 Sep 164734.7SelectedBishop of Sarlat, France
18 May 164835.3ConfirmedBishop of Sarlat, France
26 Jul 164835.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sarlat, France
19 May 165643.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Cahors, France
1657¹44.0ResignedBishop of Sarlat, France
24 Sep 165744.7ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Cahors, France
31 Dec 165946.9SucceededBishop of Cahors, France
9 Nov 167865.8DiedBishop of Cahors, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Sévin:
Bishop Nicolas Sévin (died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 305, and Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015