Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Etienne de Caulet

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1610BornToulouse
14 Jun 164434.0SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Jan 164534.6ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
5 Mar 164534.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
7 Aug 168070.2DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for François-Etienne de Caulet:
Bishop François-Etienne de Caulet (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015