Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cahors

Dioecesis Cadurcensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Cahors (erected)
11 July 1317Territory LostDiocese of Cahors
Diocese of Toulouse
Diocese of Montauban (erected)
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Rodez (suppressed) Diocese of Cahors
Diocese of Saint-Flour
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Vabres (suppressed) Diocese of Cahors
Diocese of Montpellier
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Cahors Diocese of Rodez
8 December 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Cahors (from Albi)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950154,500155,00099.7%2601127157031645480ap1951
1959147,754.0%23313246025313478ap1960
1970145,000151,00096.0%193820172113358405ap1971
1980143,500151,50094.7%14371509567260403ap1981
1990143,700159,40090.2%112101221,17715167403ap1991
1999140,350155,81390.1%98121101,275312123403ap2000
2000140,010155,81389.9%98121101,272312117403ap2001
2001143,200160,12489.4%95101051,363310112403ap2002
2002143,050160,12489.3%89111001,430411105403ap2003
2003142,900160,12489.2%858931,5365894403ap2004
2004142,900160,12489.2%836891,6054688403ap2005
2006144,000161,60089.1%909991,4541981403ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013